HI HB2371 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 3:10PM in Conference Room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 3:10PM in Conference Room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the amount and threshold of the refundable food/excise tax credit and income tax credit for low-income household renters. Creates a new low-income tax credit and earned income tax credit. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Refundable Food/Excise Tax Credit; Income Tax Credit for Low-Income Household Renters; Low-Income Tax Credit; Earned Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 3:10PM in Conference Room 229. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 12:50PM in Conference Room 229. |
2014-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-23-14 4:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 695). |
2014-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Carroll, Luke Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Woodson, Johanson Members; |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ige Chair; Chun Oakland Co-Chair; Kidani, Kouchi, Slom Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 640) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3257) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-28-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 185). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 743-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 533-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-13 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Hashem, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Belatti, Creagan, Oshiro. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-13-14 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |