HI HB2375 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 162, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1271).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 162, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1271).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits advanced practice registered nurses to certify an employee's disability. Increases the penalty an employer is assessed for failing to submit timely wage and employment information. Permits filing of an appeal of a decision related to temporary disability insurance at the various offices of the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations throughout the State. Allows the department to send notices of hearing electronically or by first-class mail. Clarifies that when the notice of hearing cannot be delivered to a party in the appeal, the notice may be given by online posting on the department's webpage. Allows the parties to a hearing to appear in person, via telephone, or by other communication devices. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Temporary Disability Insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 162, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1271). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 162, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1271). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-04-26 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Keohokalole, McDermott excused (2). |
2018-04-26 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 678). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 672). |
2018-04-25 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-18. |
2018-04-25 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Baker, Taniguchi Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Takumi, Holt Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2018-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 569) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3434) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from LBR/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3173) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to LBR/CPH, JDC. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 220). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 540-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 244-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-06-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2802 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to LBR/CPH, JDC.
Subjects
Disability Certification
Hearing Location
Notice
Service
Submission of Wage and Employment Information
Temporary Disability Insurance
Hearing Location
Notice
Service
Submission of Wage and Employment Information
Temporary Disability Insurance