HI HB2380 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the judiciary to contract with nonprofit organizations to provide legal assistance and legal counsel to immigrants in determining legal status and citizenship, provide diversion to existing services, and otherwise provide counsel for existing rights. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Immigration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:05AM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 223). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 896-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 316-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2829 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.