HI HB24 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB24
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the criminal offense of sexual assault of an animal. Provides for impoundment and forfeiture of a sexually assaulted animal.
Title
Relating To Animal Sexual Abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-08-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB24 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=24&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB24_.HTM |