HI HB2405 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporates socially responsible investing in the investment decision-making of endowment, trust, or investment funds established by statute or maintained by state agencies or offices.
Title
Relating To Socially Responsible Investing.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3085 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2405&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2405_.HTM |