HI HB2417 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to establish a neighbor islands blind and visually impaired service pilot program to provide services and training for blind and visually impaired neighbor island residents. Appropriates funds. Repeals on 6/30/2021. Takes effect on 12/31/2059. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 226). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Nishimoto. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 386-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Tokioka. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 02-07-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2248 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.