HI HB2420 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the meaning of "program or activity receiving state financial assistance". Excludes cases within the scope of the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act from the jurisdiction of the Hawaii civil rights commission. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Civil Rights Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417). |
2020-07-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 599) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3755) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-30-20 9:46AM in conference room 016. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3471) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 331). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 980-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-11 | House | Re-referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 229-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSH/LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2244 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36