HI HB2423 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the minimum wage to $12.25 per hour in 2019 and $15 per hour in 2020. Repeals language allowing the hourly wage of a tipped employee to be increased on account of tips. Requires the department of labor and industrial relations to annually calculate the adjusted minimum wage rate to the nearest five cents using the Honolulu region CPI-W.
Title
Relating To Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2291 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2423&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2423_.HTM |