HI HB2435 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 189, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 189, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "rates" in Hawaii's Motor Carrier Law to clarify that, for packages that include other, non-transportation services, "rates" only refers to charges for the provision of transportation by motor vehicle of passengers. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Motor Carriers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 189, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 189, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1298). |
2018-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 703). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Onishi, Takumi excused (2). |
2018-05-01 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 695). |
2018-04-27 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18. |
2018-04-25 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Baker, Espero Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Takumi Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 732) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3596) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 04-06-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3146) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to TRE, CPH. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 227). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1009-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2018-02-12 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-14-18 10:30AM in conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |