HI HB2449 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes cash payments made by developers in lieu of providing the required reserved housing units in the development of residential projects for the Hawaii community development authority to be deposited into the rental housing revolving fund. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3627) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-12-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 91). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 742-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 483-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-20 10:20AM in conference room 423. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:45AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2965 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to HOU, WAM.