HI HB245 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB245
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the powers of the Hawaii Teacher Standards Board to include approving professional development courses and programs necessary for teacher reclassification. (HB245 HD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1454) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 152). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1090), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 443) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB245 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.