HI HB2464 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 179, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1288).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 179, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1288).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to conduct a study on the issue of Hawaiian Home Lands lessees selling or transferring their leases for a fee or other personal gain and then applying for a subsequent lease and submit a report of the findings and recommendations of its study, including any proposed legislation, to the Legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the Regular Session of 2020. (HB2464 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Andria Tupola [R] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 179, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1288). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 179, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1288). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 117-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 117-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, DeCoite, Gates, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 11:01AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 11:01AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-18 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-19-18 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Galuteria. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ing, San Buenaventura, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Gates, Tupola. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2018-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 571) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3413) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3108) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, English, Green, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 03-20-18 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 1:40PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 230). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 710-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-15-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 279-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, DeCoite, Creagan, Gates, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 02-06-18 9:45AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2984 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.