HI HB2486 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a statewide sustainability branch within the Office of Planning. Updates and reaffirms the role of the office to coordinate among state agencies regarding climate change adaptation and sustainability. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Office Of Planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration; agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 424). |
2020-07-10 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ohno excused (2). |
2020-07-10 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2020-07-10 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 07-08-20. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417). |
2020-07-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 602) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3786) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-07-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 07-02-20 10:10AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3692) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 06-24-20 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-20 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 335). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1005-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from EEP/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WLH on Thursday, 02-06-20 9:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Climate Change
COVID-19 Economic Resilience
Office of Planning
Statewide Planning
Statewide Sustainability Branch
Sustainability
COVID-19 Economic Resilience
Office of Planning
Statewide Planning
Statewide Sustainability Branch
Sustainability