HI HB2502 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Director of Health, upon consultation with and authorization from the Governor, to screen, test, and monitor travelers. Provides for penalties for noncompliance. Amends and adds definitions and procedural and administrative provisions in chapter 325, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Allocates funds appropriated to the Governor by Senate Bill No. 126, S.D. 1, H.D. 1, C.D. 1, to be used for health assurance and grants for hotels to conduct COVID-19 testing for employees. Establishes a travelers screening special fund. Allocates funds from the transient accommodations tax to the travelers screening special fund for a portion of fiscal year 2020-2021. Sunsets certain provisions on 6/30/2022.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] |
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417). |
2020-07-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 603) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kim . Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, K. Kahele, Ruderman). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3789) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-07-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kanuha, Riviere, Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) K. Kahele; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 07-02-20 10:10AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3688) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Wakai, Fevella. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 06-25-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 242). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 842-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 412-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-10-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 51-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Communicable or Dangerous Diseases
COVID-19 Testing
Department of Health
Grants for Hotels
Isolation
Monitoring
Penalties
Quarantine
Screening
Communicable or Dangerous Diseases
COVID-19 Testing
Department of Health
Grants for Hotels
Isolation
Monitoring
Penalties
Quarantine
Screening