HI HB2507 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 175, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1284).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 175, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1284).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes housekeeping amendments to remove preschools from the Superintendent's scope of authority and to clarify that the Executive Office on Early Learning Director may authorize preschool personnel access to a student's immunization registry information. Requires the DOE to administer special education and Title I funded programs at the prekindergarten level. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Preschools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 175, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1284). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 175, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1284). |
2018-06-25 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-18 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155) |
2018-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 633). |
2018-04-20 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). |
2018-04-20 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 629). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 627). |
2018-04-19 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-06-18. |
2018-04-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Mizuno, Todd Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 490). |
2018-04-06 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 490) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3384) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee on EDU will reconsider its previous decision on 03-16-18 and will hold a public decision making on 03-28-18 2:51PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Dela Cruz. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-16-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 108). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 852-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 529-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 02-13-18 10:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHS with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Souki excused (3). |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 93-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHS. |
2018-01-31 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 01-31-18 2:05PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EDN, HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |