HI HB2513 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 037, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 037, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that an affirmation be filed with the court at the time a mortgage foreclosure action is commenced.
Title
Mortgage Foreclosures; Affirmation Required When Action Commenced
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Act 037, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137). |
2014-04-25 | House | Act 037, on 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137). |
2014-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 503). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3331) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Solomon, Slom. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-28-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2855) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 193). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 697-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Cachola, Takai excused (3). |
2014-02-10 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 258-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Yamane. |
2014-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-14. |
2014-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-03-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2513&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2513_.HTM |