HI HB252 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 175, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 175, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for a pharmacy benefit manager that reimburses a contracting pharmacy for a drug on a maximum allowable cost basis. Requires pharmacy benefit managers to have a clearly defined process for a contracting pharmacy to appeal the maximum allowable cost for a drug on a maximum allowable cost list and establishes requirements for that process. (HB252 CD1)
Title
Pharmacy Benefit Manager; Maximum Allowable Cost; Contracting Pharmacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Act 175, 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276). |
2015-07-02 | House | Act 175, on 06/30/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276). |
2015-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 71). |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 71) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Belatti, Nishimoto, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 8:20AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-27-15 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-24-15 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-22-15 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Baker, Kouchi Co-Chairs; Wakai, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Belatti, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-referred to CPC, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 521) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1485) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-15 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1045) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH, CPN/WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 164). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say, Souki excused (2). |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 605) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Oshiro, Yamane. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-15. |
2015-02-03 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-04-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-15. |
2015-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 01-29-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-29-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |