HI HB2558 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to EEP/TRN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to EEP/TRN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the electric vehicle parking fee exemption at airports to drivers of electric vehicles who are airline passengers, as evidenced by a valid airline ticket or boarding pass. Extends the repeal date of Act 168, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, from 6/30/2020 to 6/30/2028.
Title
Relating To Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP/TRN, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2558&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2558_.HTM |