HI HB2572 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modernizes "personal information" for the purposes of security breach of personal information law. Prohibits the sale of contact tracing information without consent. Amends provisions relating to electronic eavesdropping law. Prohibits certain manipulated images of individuals. Effective 9/1/2020. Sunsets 9/1/2025. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Privacy.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Technology and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 07-02-20 10:45AM in conference room 016. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-30-20 9:46AM in conference room 016. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Reported from CPH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3689) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, English, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Wakai. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/TEC deferred the measure until 06-25-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/TEC deferred the measure until 06-24-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-23-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/TEC, JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 342). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tokioka voting no (2) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from JUD/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 795-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Kong; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno, Matsumoto. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD/CPC on Tuesday, 02-25-20 3:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-12 | House | Re-referred to JUD/CPC, referral sheet 28 |
2020-02-10 | House | Recommitted to JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Gates excused. |
2020-02-10 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 284-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to JUD for further consideration. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Creagan, Say. |
2020-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Attorney General
Contact Tracing Information
Deep Fakes
Notice
Personal Information
Privacy
Search Warrants
Contact Tracing Information
Deep Fakes
Notice
Personal Information
Privacy
Search Warrants