HI HB259 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB259
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to digitize its applicant, beneficiary, and lessee records and create a usable digital database no later than July 1, 2020. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The Hawaiian Homes Commission Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 547), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:01PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 5) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-01-25 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-01-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 01-25-19 10:35AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB259 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
SB695 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
SB695 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).