HI HB2593 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Re-referred to TRN/EEP, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Re-referred to TRN/EEP, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of new motor vehicles that are solely powered by fossil fuels and designed for personal use beginning January 1, 2030, by motor vehicle dealers and salespersons.
Title
Relating To Ground Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Re-referred to TRN/EEP, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN/EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2593&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2593_.HTM |