HI HB2601 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 215, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 215, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the rental motor vehicle surcharge from $3 to $5 for lessees without a valid Hawaii driver's license from the rental motor vehicle surcharge. Requires that the revenues from the increase in motor vehicle surcharge tax be expended for state highway road capacity projects in the county in which the rental motor vehicle was operated under rental or lease. Increases the tour vehicle surcharge by $1 for each category of tour vehicle. (HB2601 CD2)
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 215, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1324). |
2018-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 215, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1324). |
2018-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 707). |
2018-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 852). |
2018-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 05-03-18. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Report filed. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 21 offered. |
2018-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-03-18. |
2018-05-01 | House | Floor amendment adopted as amended CD 2 with none voting no and none excused. |
2018-05-01 | House | Floor Amendment No. 3 offered by Rep. Aquino. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 182-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 182-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Baker, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamashita, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-25 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 836). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senators Baker, Dela Cruz added as Co-Chairs. Senator Shimabukuro added as Conferee. Senators Keith-Agaran, English discharged as Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 834). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Keith-Agaran discharged as Chair; Added as Co-Chair. Senator Inouye discharged as Co-Chair; Added as Chair. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 831). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Inouye, English Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Ward. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 750) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3579) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from TRE/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3131) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to TRE/CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 238). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Kong, Tokioka, Tupola voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 992-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 699-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-14-18 10:30AM in conference room 423. |
2018-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-18. |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-09-18 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3009 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to TRE, WAM.
Subjects
Rental Motor Vehicle Surcharge
State Highway Fund
State Highway Road Capacity Projects
Tour Vehicle Surcharge
State Highway Fund
State Highway Road Capacity Projects
Tour Vehicle Surcharge