HI HB2611 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee(s) on PVM/TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee(s) on PVM/TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases fees imposed upon importers, wholesalers, storage sites, and retailers for licenses on fireworks. Authorizes counties to use fees for costs related to inspecting shipped containers of aerial devices when they are opened.
Title
Relating To Fireworks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on PVM/TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM/TRN on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to PVM/TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2986 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2611&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2611_.HTM |