HI HB2615 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the monthly needs allowance for individuals residing in foster homes, care homes, domiciliary homes, and other long-term care facilities. Amends the state supplemental payment ceiling for domiciliary care paid to recipients who are eligible for federal supplementary security income or public assistance, or both. Takes effect on 12/31/2059. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Social Services.
Sponsors
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-17-20 10:25AM in conference room 211. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3402) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-06-20 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 261). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 945-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-27-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 482-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2020-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 02-12-20 9:05AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |