HI HB2620 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 5:35PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 5:35PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii Sea Grant College Program to submit a report updating the 1996 report on oil spills. Appropriates funds for staffing and resources to update the 1996 report. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Oil Spill Prevention; Sea Grant College Program; University of Hawaii; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 5:35PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:15PM in conference room 329 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 1:20PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-14 10:01AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 679). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Gabbard, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; L. Thielen, Slom Members. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Choy, Cullen Co-Chairs; Lowen, Thielen Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 665) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3279) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:25AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported from HRE/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2967) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Tokuda. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-14 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HRE/ENE, WAM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 112). |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 611-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 425-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-02-11 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Awana, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Takai. |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-11-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 103-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2014-01-30 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Say, Nishimoto, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-30-14 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, HED, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB3016 (Same As) 2014-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.