HI HB2626 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Luke, Cachola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Luke, Cachola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an income tax credit for taxpayers who incur certain expenses for manufacturing products in Hawaii. Appropriates funds for DBEDT to certify claims for the tax credit. Effective 7/1/2050. Repeals 1/1/2023. (SD2)
Title
Manufacturing Tax Credit; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Luke, Cachola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-28-14 4:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 3:00PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 3:00PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 3:00PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 2:00PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 2:30PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Luke Co-Chairs; Cachola, Ward Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Kidani, Wakai, Slom Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 666) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3280) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-28-14 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2846) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-14 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 380). |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Choy, Hanohano, Ing, Jordan, McKelvey, Oshiro, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ito voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 875-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Choy, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 421-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-11 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Awana, Brower, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2014-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-11-14 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |