HI HB2627 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that Chapter 1, Subchapter Z (with respect to opportunity zones), of the Internal Revenue Code shall not be operative for the purposes of state income tax law. Takes effect on 7/1/2112. Applies to tax years beginning after 12/31/2022. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 104). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 711-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Matayoshi, Nakamura, McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 651-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 10:35AM in conference room 309. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-20. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-20. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:35AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |