HI HB2646 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 244, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 244, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a permanent fuel tank advisory committee to study, monitor, and address fuel tank leak issues. (HB2646 CD1)
Title
Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility; Fuel Tank Advisory Committee; Monitor Wells ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 244, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 244, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1353). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 142-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 142-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Yamane, Lowen, Johanson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 3:30PM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 3:30PM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-16 3:30PM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-22 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 688). |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Discharged: Senator L. Thielen discharged as Conferee. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Baker, Inouye Co-Chairs; L. Thielen, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Yamane, Lowen Co-Chairs; Johanson, Ward. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 634) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3508) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 2:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported from EET/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2997) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara, Ruderman. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Ihara, Keith-Agaran. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-16 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPH, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 344). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 877-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 573-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2016-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-16-16 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 169-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2016-02-04 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-03 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |