HI HB267 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB267
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 4:00PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 4:00PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires drug manufacturers to notify prescription drug benefit plans and pharmacy benefit managers if a proposed increase in the wholesale price of certain drugs would result in a sixteen per cent or more price increase over a twoyear period. Requires the drug manufacturer to identify and report to the insurance commissioner information on certain drugs whose wholesale acquisition cost increases by a certain amount during a specified time frame. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Prescription Drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi Co-Chairs; Belatti, Ward. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719). |
2019-04-09 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 668) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1782) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 22). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 878), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno, Onishi. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 402) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB267 (Carry Over) 2019-04-24 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 4:00PM in conference room 229.
SB1328 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1328 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Insurance Commissioner
Notification
Prescription Drugs
Price Increases
Insurance Commissioner
Notification
Prescription Drugs
Price Increases