HI HB2682 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 289, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1406).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 289, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1406).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Land and Natural Resources to regulate the commercial use of state waters and marine resources. Effective 07/01/2012. (SD1)
Title
Ocean Resources; Commercial Activities, Department of Land and Natural Resources
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 289, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1406). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 289, on 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1406). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 704). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 678). | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-12. | |
2012-04-24 | (H) The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, McKelvey, Har, Jordan, Nakashima, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Conference Committee will reconvene decision making on Tuesday 04-24-12 2:00PM in Conference Room 224. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee will have decision making on Monday 04-23-12 2:00PM in Conference Room 224. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 754). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Dela Cruz, Wakai, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Chang, McKelvey, Har Co-Chairs; Jordan, Nakashima, Riviere. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Re-referred to WLO, ERB, FIN, referral sheet 65 | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 654) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3260) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Reported from EDT/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2992) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 03-20-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT/WLH, WAM. | |
2012-03-13 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/WLH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-19-12 1:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-12 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT/WLH, CPN. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to WLH, CPN. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 286). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 872-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-29-12 2:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2). | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 476-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-13 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 02-13-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 8 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |