HI HB269 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-19 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-19-13 at 3:15 PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-19 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-19-13 at 3:15 PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the state constitution to require candidates for the state senate or house of representatives to be a resident of the legislative district from which the person is a candidate for not less than twelve consecutive months prior to the next general election, except in the year of the first general election following reapportionment when the candidate shall be required to be a resident of the legislative district for not less than one month prior to the deadline for filing nomination papers. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Constitutional Amendment; Residency; State Legislators (ConAm)
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-19-13 at 3:15 PM in Conference Room 325. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-19-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 4:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Rhoads, Yamashita Co-Chairs; C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 3). |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 598) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz, Ige, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Espero, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-13. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 11 offered. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1299) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-21-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 10:05AM in conference room 16. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 82). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Ing, McKelvey, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Evans, Fale, Hashem, Ichiyama, Ito, Kawakami, Onishi, Oshiro, Takayama, Takumi, Tokioka, Yamashita voting no (12) and Representative(s) Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 655), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 218) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-01-31 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Cabanilla, Kawakami, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Ito, C. Lee, Wooley. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-31-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |