HI HB269 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB269
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the sale of stored property insurance by self-service storage facility owners under certain conditions. Requires self-service storage facility owners to hold a limited lines license in order to sell, solicit, or offer coverage under a stored property insurance policy. (HB269 HD1)
Title
Relating To Self-service Storage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 217) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-19 11:31AM in conference room 430. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-19 at 11:31 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB269 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB817 (Same As) 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 284, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1404).
SB817 (Same As) 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 284, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1404).