HI HB2694 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation to provide funds for the state public charter school commission to pay the claim and settlement amount pursuant to Miller-Potter v. State of Hawaii, et al., Civil No. 16-1-0385K. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Making An Emergency Appropriation To The State Public Charter School Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 540-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-20 2:01pm. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-10-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 61-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:20PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3180 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.