HI HB2699 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes clean ground transportation goals for state agencies on a staggered basis until achieving a 100 per cent light-duty motor vehicle clean fleet by 12/31/2035. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from GVO/EET/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3670) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, J.Keohokalole. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET will hold a public decision making on 06-22-20 3:05PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 03-13-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 03-11-20 1:14PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 03-16-20 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/EET/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EET/TRS, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 110). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 733-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 462-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-11-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from EEP/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 248-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/TRN on Tuesday, 02-04-20 11:05AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to EEP/TRN, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-28 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 01-30-20 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-30-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |