HI HB270 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 199, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Defines "flood damage" as it relates to a rebuilt vehicle. Expands the definition of "rebuilt vehicle" to include vehicles that have been rebuilt after sustaining flood damage or material damage to the vehicle's electronics. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Rebuilt Vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 199, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
2019-07-09HouseAct 199, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-30SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 880).
2019-04-26HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
2019-04-26SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 874).
2019-04-26HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 814).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Takumi Co-Chairs; D. Kobayashi, McDermott.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 711) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-04SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1865) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
2019-03-22SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1431) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 03-20-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:00PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to TRS, CPH.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 23).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 880), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno, Onishi.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 410) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:15AM in House conference room 430.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to IAC, CPC , referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB822 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback