HI HB2707 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the behavioral health social worker scholarship program at UH, which requires recipients of the scholarship to commit to five years of service with DHS, DOH, PSD, Judiciary, or contracted service providers. Appropriates funds. Takes effect on December 31, 2059. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Mental Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HRE, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 273). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 831-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 578-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 230-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HSH, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |