HI HB2708 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 665).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 665).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to establish a public involvement process when developing the statewide transportation plan. Effective on approval. (SD1)
Title
Statewide Transportation Plan; Public Involvement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 665). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 427). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 628). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 619). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 03-16-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). | |
2010-04-22 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Souki, Awana Co-Chairs; Aquino, Pine. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Souki, Awana Co-Chairs; Aquino, Pine. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Gabbard, Slom. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-03-16 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 268). | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 346) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-15 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-15-10. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-12 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2714) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-08 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-08-10 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to TIA. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 144). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 652-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-25 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-10 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 277-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-08-10 9:00am in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |