HI HB2710 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee(s) on PVM/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - The committee(s) on PVM/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a law enforcement officer to search a person convicted of violating certain temporary restraining orders or protective orders, including the person's motor vehicle and the person's residence, for firearms without obtaining a search warrant if the law enforcement officer has reason to believe acts of abuse, malicious property damage, or harassment by the person are imminent. Specifies that a seized firearm shall not be used for a subsequent conviction if the original search lacked probable cause but authorizes law enforcement to maintain the firearm until the registered owner can prove the firearm will be safely stored.
Title
Relating To Protective Orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on PVM/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM/JUD on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:15PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-31 | House | Re-referred to PVM/JUD, referral sheet 13 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Domestic Abuse
Firearm Search
Harassment
Malicious Property Damage
Protective Orders
Temporary Restraining Orders
Violation
Firearm Search
Harassment
Malicious Property Damage
Protective Orders
Temporary Restraining Orders
Violation
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2710&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2710_.HTM |