HI HB272 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 950).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Caps annual utility rate increases without PUC approval for counties with a population of less than 500,000. Provides telecommunications service providers with flexibility from certain regulatory oversight requirements, including issuance of securities and other evidences of indebtedness, and sales or disposition of property or equipment, if the utility is providing fully competitive retail services and specific conditions are met. Specifies other requirements related to flexibility for telecommunications service providers. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Telecommunications.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 950).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 712) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-05SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1894) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-12SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to TEC, CPH.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 24).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso, San Buenaventura, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 901), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-14HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 449), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 241) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-07-19 11:31AM in conference room 430.
2019-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-19 at 11:31 AM.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 430.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB991 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 229, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback