HI HB273 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 200, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an exemption for insurers from the required annual privacy notice to customers under certain circumstances. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Privacy Notice For Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 200, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302).
2019-07-09HouseAct 200, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1302).
2019-04-24HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-04-25SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 859).
2019-04-24HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1).
2019-04-24HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-24SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 854).
2019-04-23HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-09-19.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-11SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719).
2019-04-09HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-05HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 669) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19.
2019-04-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1774) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee on CPH will reconsider its previous decision on 03-14-19 and will hold a public decision making on 03-21-19 9:15AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 360).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 934) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Thursday, 02-21-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB826 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback