HI HB2742 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 159, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 159, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Office of Medical Cannabis Control and Regulation in the Department of Health to regulate and administer the registration of qualifying patients and primary caregivers and medical cannabis dispensaries. Extends civil service exemptions for persons in civil service exempt positions prior to enactment of this measure who will transfer into the Office due to this measure. Extends interim rulemaking authority. Appropriates funds. (HB2742 CD1)
Title
Relating To Medical Cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 159, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 159, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1268). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 169-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 169-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Espero. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 772) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3675) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3192) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-21-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 124). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 815-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Lowen, Todd, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 509-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-08-18 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-18 at 11:30 AM in room 329. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |