HI HB275 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB275
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prioritizes the duties of the division of the consumer advocate to proceedings that involve accounting, financing, and utility rates.
Title
Relating To The Division Of The Consumer Advocate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB275 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB758 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
SB758 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=275&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB275_.HTM |