HI HB2751 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the conditions for authorizing a restricted driver's license. Provides judges with greater discretion to adjust the amount owed by a person who violates certain traffic offenses based on the person's inability to pay. Decreases the imprisonment term to contumacious nonpayment ratio. Increases the amount of credit given to a person committed for contumacious nonpayment. Provides Hawaii residents with the option of paying for the registration of their motor vehicles and associated taxes and fees on a biannual basis. Restricts the amount of delinquency tax due to the current tax due plus one year. Removes language allowing storage costs and costs incident to seizure of a vehicle from inclusion in the amount the owner of a vehicle must pay in order to redeem the vehicle after seizure. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Financial Hardship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 278). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 905-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 642-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-07 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Biannual Basis
Contumacious Nonpayment
Director of Finance
Financial Hardship
Hardship
Motor Vehicles
Registration
Restricted Driver's License
Traffic Offenses
Contumacious Nonpayment
Director of Finance
Financial Hardship
Hardship
Motor Vehicles
Registration
Restricted Driver's License
Traffic Offenses