HI HB2832 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 196, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 688).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 196, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 688).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Office of Hawaiian Affairs to seek funding for projects that increase the cultivation and use of taro. Requires the Taro Security and Purity Task Force to implement the recommendations in their report submitted pursuant to Act 211, Session Laws of Hawaii 2008, and submit a final report on implementation prior the convening of the Regular Session of 2015. (HB2832 CD1)
Title
Taro Security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 196, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 688). | |
2010-07-07 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 196, 7/6/2010, (Gov. Msg. No. 450). | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 138-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 138-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tsutsui, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ito, M. Oshiro, Nakashima, Sagum, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Finnegan. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-10 4:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-10 4:10PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-19-10 4:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Re-referred to AGR/WLO, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 65 | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Tsuji, Ito, Carroll, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Sagum, Wooley, Finnegan. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Hemmings. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 462). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 479) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3025) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-24-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-17 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2742) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Fukunaga, Takamine, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Bunda, Kokubun. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-10 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 226). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 503-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-22-10 4:35PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-22-10. | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-19-10 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 26 | |
2010-01-28 | (H) Referred to AGR/WLO, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Passed First Reading |