HI HB298 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to EET, CPH.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes any government agency to engage in the wheeling of electricity that is produced at its own facilities from renewable energy resources, subject to disallowance by the Public Utilities Commission. Designates the Natural Energy Laboratory of Hawaii Authority as a microgrid demonstration project. Authorizes the Public Utilities Commission to allow wheeling within the boundaries of the Hawaii Ocean Science and Technology Park. (HB298 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Intra-governmental Wheeling.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateReferred to EET, CPH.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 157).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1053), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-02-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-11HouseRe-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 20
2019-02-04HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
2019-02-04HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 34) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-01-29HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-01-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback