HI HB3 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB3
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redirects the $1,000,000 of transient accommodations tax revenues currently allocated to operate a Hawaiian center and the museum of Hawaiian music and dance at the Hawaii convention center to have the State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History plan, design, and construct such a facility on their property.
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Music And Dance.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB1007 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB1007 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaiian Music and Dance
State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History
Transient Accommodations Tax
State of Hawaii Museum of Natural and Cultural History
Transient Accommodations Tax
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=3&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB3_.HTM |