HI HB303 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB303
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a Patient Lift Task Force to address employee health and safety in lifting and transporting patients in a hospital setting. Requires a report, including proposed legislation, to the Legislature. (HB303 HD1)
Title
Relating To Occupational Health And Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB303 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.