HI HB309 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB309
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the extension of the zipper lane on the H-1 Freeway to Kapolei in the vicinity of the Kualakai parkway on/off ramp. (HB309 HD1)
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1317) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 28). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 921), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 286) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB309 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.