HI HB312 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB312
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 2:30PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 2:30PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii, West Oahu campus, to offer a Bachelor of Arts degree in creative media by the start of the 2020 spring semester. Repeals the annual $35,000,000 rolling cap and extends the repeal date for the motion picture, digital media, and film production income tax credit; provided that title to a certain parcel of University of Hawaii, West Oahu campus land is successfully transferred to the Hawaii Technology Development Corporation. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Creative Media.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825). |
2019-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 3:45PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Luke Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2019-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 900). |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Fevella. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 717) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2037) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-19 10:45AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1354) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 03-19-19 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 29). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 914), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 437) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 02-08-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB312 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 2:30PM in conference room 329.
SB1512 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27
SB1512 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27