HI HB314 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a certificate issuer to redeem the remaining value of a gift certificate for cash if the gift certificate has a balance of less than $5. Takes effect 1/1/2020. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Gift Certificates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-03SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 887).
2019-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
2019-05-02HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-30HouseReconsideration of action taken on 03-28-19.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-03-29SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 515).
2019-03-28HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-03-27HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 536) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-27SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Moriwaki, Riviere, L. Thielen . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Ruderman). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-27-19.
2019-03-25SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-25SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1532) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 30).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 873), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno, Onishi.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 656) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-01HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-01-30HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19 10:00AM.
2019-01-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 01-30-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback